Covington v. American Railcar Industries Inc
Plaintiff: James Covington
Defendant: American Railcar Industries Inc
Case Number: 3:2017cv00145
Filed: June 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ON JOINT MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF THE CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/23/2018. (jak)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 18 Motion to permit Tabitha G. Davisson to appear pro hac vice as co-counsel for the defendant in this action. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/8/2018. (jak)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 16 Motion. The deadline for filing the final settlement papers for approval is extended up to and including 5/7/2018. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/1/2018. (jak)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF PRELIMINARY APPROVAL. The notice of proposed settlement included with the joint motion for preliminary approval is adequate and is hereby approved. A final fairness hearing will be conducted at 1:00 p.m. on 5/14/2018 at the United States Dis trict Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas, 615 South Main St. Jonesboro, Arkansas 72401. The parties must file motion papers for final approval of all terms of the settlement agreement no later than 14 days before the final fairness hearing. This action is stayed pending a ruling on the settlement at the final fairness hearing. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/19/2018. (jak)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 12 Motion to Stay. The action is stayed for an additional seven days. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/11/2018. (jak)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 Joint Motion to stay proceedings for an additional 45 days. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/27/2017. (jak)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 8 Joint Motion to stay proceedings for a period of 90 days. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/31/2017. (jak)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting 6 Motion. The defendant will have an additional 30 days, up to and including 8/30/2017 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. The statute of limitations is tolled for any prospective opt-in plaintiffs for a period equal to the number of days between 6/29/2017 and the date the defendant answers or otherwise responds to the complaint. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/28/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Covington v. American Railcar Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Covington
Represented By: Christopher Wesley Burks
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Railcar Industries Inc
Represented By: Carolyn B. Witherspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?