Nelson v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Donna Nelson
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2017cv00158
Filed: June 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 JUDGMENT consistent with 20 Order, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Judgment is entered in favor of the Commissioner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/28/2018. (jak)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER relieving Mr. Throesch as counsel for Ms. Nelson. The Clerk of the Court is directed to update the docket sheet to terminate Mr. Throesch as counsel of record and to reference Ms. Nelson as a pro se plaintiff. A new scheduling order regarding the deadlines for filing Briefs will be entered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/3/2017. (jak)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER conditionally granting 8 Motion to withdraw. Mr. Throesch has provided the Court with Ms. Nelson's mailing address, 8 . He must also return the complete file to the Plaintiff, Ms. Nelson. Mr. Throesch will have 21 days from the entry of this Order to meet this condition. Once Mr. Throesch certifies that he has taken the required action, the Court will direct the Clerk to terminate Mr. Throesch as counsel of record for Ms. Nelson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/16/2017. (jak)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Paperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to prepare a summons and forward it to Ms. Nelson's counsel for service of the Complaint upon the Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/21/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Nelson
Represented By: David Jerome Throesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?