Bowen v. Ring et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Bowen
Defendant: Matthew Ring, Greene County, Arkansas, Greene County Sheriff's Department, Greene County Detention Center, David Carter and John Does
Case Number: 3:2017cv00214
Filed: August 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 JUDGMENT: Bowen's first amended complaint is dismissed with prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction until 5/10/2019 to enforce the parties' settlement. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/10/2019. (jak)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 Joint motion. The 22 Protective Order is amended to include the agreed provisions contained within this Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/3/2018. (jak)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/18/2017. (jak)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: The Court appreciates the parties' concise proposed protective order. Please make the noted changes, send the revised order to chambers, and the Court will sign it. 20 Motion granted as modified. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/7/2017. (jak)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 9 Motion. Greene County is a defendant. The Sheriff's Department and the Detention Center are arms of the County, which don't need to be named as separate parties. They are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/22/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowen v. Ring et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Bowen
Represented By: Christopher Aaron Averitt
Represented By: S. King Benson
Represented By: Tony L. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Ring
Represented By: Thomas J. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene County, Arkansas
Represented By: Thomas J. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Thomas J. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene County Detention Center
Represented By: Thomas J. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Carter
Represented By: Thomas J. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?