Robins et al v. Wood
Petitioner: Helen Robins and Centennial Bank
Respondent: Rena Wood
Movant: Georgia Elizabeth Stiny Ratzenberger, Nina Ratzenberger, James Ratzenberger, Eli Stiny, Alexis Stiny, Andrew Stiny, Julianne Stiny, Elijah Nicholas Stiny, Alison Sorley and Christopher Sorley
Case Number: 3:2017cv00227
Filed: August 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Lawrence
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: Status report 322 appreciated. The Court appreciates the good progress on notice to qualified beneficiaries and interested parties. Report on service of the rest of them due by 1/6/2020. The Court appreciates the monthly reports from Linder & Associates. Further monthly reports due 1/6/2020. 322 Request for attorney's fees granted. 323 Motion for attorney's fees granted. The Court directs the Clerk to file this Order in this case and 3:17-cv-227; administratively close 3:17-cv-2 27; open a new case, styled In re Elijah and Mary Stiny Trusts; mark 3:17-cv-226 and 3:17-cv-227 as cases related to the new one; and associate the following attorneys with the new case: Elan Darvish, Martin Emmett Lilly, and G.S. Brant Perkins. Key orders from those two cases will be available as landmarks as needed in the new case. All new entries must be filed under the new case and docket number. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/2/2019. (jak)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER directing the Clerk to file this Order in both cases. Helen Robins is relieved as guardian of Mrs. Stiny's person and Joyce Roberts is appointed in her place. Beverly Moore's 299 request for another caregiver payment is denied. Co-tru stee's fees to Rena Wood directed now (for April, May, and June) from the Bank of America account and on the first of each month starting 7/1/2019. Further information from Wood-on trust-related fees, Exemption Trusts implementation, tax returns , and rent proceeds deposit-requested by 6/14/2019. Centennial is directed to dismiss the state case against the First National Bank of Lawrence County with prejudice, and provide notice to the Court by 6/14/2019. Centennial must also prepare for its discharge as guardian of Mrs. Stiny's estate, as specified. 301 Motion to appoint co-trustee granted as modified and with directions for details on Perkins's fee and bond by 6/14/2019. 45 Motion to intervene in case 3:17-cv-227 DPM denied without prejudice as moot. Roof replacement and related repairs approved and authorized. New Chase accounts for rent payments approved and authorized. 302 Joint Report, addressed.Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/15/2019. (jak)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 JUDGMENT in Consolidated case 3:17-cv-00226 DPM: Counts I, IV, V, and VII of Centennial Bank's second amended complaint are dismissed without prejudice. Counts II and III were tried to a twelve person jury from 12/11/2018 to 12/14/2018. They ret urned a unanimous verdict for Rena Wood and against Centennial Bank, 271, which is incorporated. Counts II and III of Centennial Bank's second amended complaint are dismissed with prejudice. Rena Wood is not disqualified from serving as a truste e, but the Court declares that it is in the best interest of Mrs. Stiny and all the beneficiaries of the Elijah and Mary Stiny Trust, and all its sub-trusts, that Wood serve only with a co-trustee. The Court will appoint one in due course. Centennial Bank prevailed and is entitled to this partial declaratory judgment on Count VI of its second amended complaint. Count VI is otherwise dismissed with prejudice. Count VIII is dismissed with prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction to make the trustee appointments and resolve ongoing issues about fees, expenses, and administration of the Elijah and Mary Stiny Trust, and all its sub-trusts. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/25/2019. (jak)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER directing the parties to file a joint report attaching all Arkansas circuit court docket sheets by 9/18/2017. The parties must also file a joint report listing all Stiny trust-related documents, with the documents attached, by 9/25/2017. L ast, the parties must file a joint report on the Tennessee case, with the docket sheet and all filings attached, by 9/29/2017. Centennial's second amended complaint, covering all disputed matters between the bank and Wood is due by 10/13/2017 . Docket entries 18 , 23 , 27 , and 28 are denied without prejudice. All future filings should be made solely in case No. 3:17-cv-00226 DPM. Carla Rogers Nadzam, Coleman Vassaur Taylor, and Mark Randall Johnson are listed as counsel of record but have not appeared in the current disputes. If any wish to stay on the case, he or she must file an entry of appearance by 9/18/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/11/2017. (jak)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER appointing Rena Wood as the temporary and limited-purpose trustee for the Elijah G. and Mary M. Stiny Trust, created 10/4/2000, and amended on various dates thereafter, and any related Survivor's Trust, Exemption Trust, and Marital Trust c reated pursuant to Article 5 of the original Trust. This temporary and limited-purpose trusteeship shall last until 11/7/2017. Wood must immediately provide Centennial Bank with all details about all refinancing options that have been received or tha t are received; Centennial Bank has the right to approve or disapprove the refinancing option ultimately chosen by Wood; and if the parties cannot agree on the best deal overall, then they must present the dispute to the Court. The parties' competing requests for various relief in the filings listed in paragraph 1 of this Order are granted in parted and denied in part as specified. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/6/2017. (jak)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER consolidating this case with 3:17-cv-226-DPM and designating case 3:17-cv-226-DPM as the lead case. All future filings should be made in that case number. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/30/2017. (thd)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN OF THE ESTATE. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robins et al v. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Helen Robins
Represented By: Mark Randall Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Centennial Bank
Represented By: Jim Lyons
Represented By: Carla Rogers Nadzam
Represented By: David D. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rena Wood
Represented By: Martin Emmett Lilly
Represented By: Coleman Vassaur Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Georgia Elizabeth Stiny Ratzenberger
Represented By: Christopher Sorley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Nina Ratzenberger
Represented By: Christopher Sorley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: James Ratzenberger
Represented By: Christopher Sorley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Eli Stiny
Represented By: Christopher Sorley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Alexis Stiny
Represented By: Christopher Sorley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Andrew Stiny
Represented By: Christopher Sorley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Julianne Stiny
Represented By: Christopher Sorley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Elijah Nicholas Stiny
Represented By: Christopher Sorley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Alison Sorley
Represented By: Christopher Sorley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Christopher Sorley
Represented By: Christopher Sorley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?