Rodgers v. McDaniel et al
Plaintiff: Darlene Rodgers
Defendant: Taura McDaniel, Val Price, Ralph Wilson, Jr, Mike Gibson, Katherine Dean, Greneda Johnson, Jeremy Bland, Bradley Law Firm, Desternie Richmond-Sullivan, Chelsea Fifi, Tonya Jones, Sylvia Ware, Osceola Police Department, Stefanie Smithey and Tyler Dunegan
Case Number: 3:2017cv00291
Filed: October 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 JUDGMENT pursuant to 82 and 91 Orders, Plaintiff's claims against defendants Taura McDaniel, Tonya Jones, Sylvia Ware, Judge Ralph Wilson, Jr., Judge Mike Gibson, Desternie Sullivan, Val Price, Greneda Johnson, and Dustin Jones are dismi ssed with prejudice, and Ms. Rodgers' claims against defendants Stefanie Smithey, Paul Rameriz, Tyler Dunegan, Christopher Ellis, Steve Weaver, the Osceola Police Department, Jeremy Bland, Katherine Dean, the Bradley Law Firm, Chelsea Fifi, Katherine Chlapecka, and Austin Porter, Jr., are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/4/2018. (jak)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting 31 , 34 , 44 , 50 , 59 , 69 Motions to dismiss. The Court denies 64 , 71 , 73 , 74 Motions. The Court dismisses with prejudice based on sovereign immunity Ms. Rodgers' claims against Ms. McDaniel, Ms. Jones, Ms. Ware , Judge Wilson, Judge Gibson, Ms. Sullivan, Mr. Price, Ms. Johnson, and Mr. Jones. The Court dismisses without prejudice Ms. Rodgers claims against Ms. Smithey, Mr. Ramierz, Mr. Dunegan, Mr. Ellis, Mr. Weaver, the Osceola Police Department, and Mr. Bland. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/17/2018. (jak)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER directing the Clerk to place document 73 under seal. The Court requests that Ms. Rodgers refrain from filing documents containing photographs and personal identification information with the Court. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/21/2018. (jak)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER of Recusal. The Clerk must reassign this case at random by chip exchange. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/16/2018. (jak)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER partly granting and partly denying 41 & 45 Rodgers's motion as supplemented. The Court extends Rodgers's time to serve her complaint on elusive defendants until 3/28/2018 as requested. The part of the motion requesting the Court t o not dismiss any of the defendants is denied. Rodgers has 14 calendar days to respond after being served with any motion to dismiss. Rodgers should respond on the merits to each motion to dismiss, 31 , 34 , and 44 , in a timely fashion. And the Court will then decide each motion after hearing from both sides in their filings. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/26/2018. (jak)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 4 Motion to extend time for service until 3/12/2018. Rodgers' requests for appointed counsel, 5 & 6 , are denied. She should continue to seek her own lawyer. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/23/2018. (jak)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/13/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodgers v. McDaniel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taura McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Val Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Wilson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greneda Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desternie Richmond-Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsea Fifi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osceola Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stefanie Smithey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Dunegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?