King v. Craighead County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Tyler Antonio King
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center, K Black, H Hogan and K Sullivan
Case Number: 3:2018cv00007
Filed: January 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Patricia S. Harris
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 JUDGMENT pursuant to 19 Order, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/4/2018. (jak)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER adopting 7 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in its entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. King's claims against Defendant Hogan is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from the Order adopting this recommendation would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/16/2018. (jak)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summonses for defendants K. Black and K. Sullivan. The United States Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the 5 Amended Complaint and summonses on these defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 2/22/2018. (jak) (Docket text modified on 2/22/2018 to correct the description of the document filed) (jak)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS. The Clerk of Court is directed to enclose an IFP application along with a copy of this Order. Plaintiff is directed to enclose a completed IFP application, including an accompanying calculation sheet and certificate signed by an authorized official within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 1/22/2018. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Craighead County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Antonio King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?