Trammell v. Carter et al

Plaintiff: Rodney Trammell
Defendant: Dustin Estes
Case Number: 3:2018cv00016
Filed: January 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 JUDGMENT: Trammell's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/29/2019. (jak)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 17 Motion to compel. Trammell must respond to Estes's discovery requests - or notify Estes's lawyer if he believes any of the requests are improper under the Rules - by 3/8/2019. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/19/2019. (jak)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Motion. Colin Jorgensen is substituted as counsel of record for Estes. Kolton Jones is relieved as counsel. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/8/2019. (jak)
October 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER reopening the time for Trammell to serve Estes until 12/24/2018. The Court directs the Clerk to prepare another summons for Estes and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the complaint, summons, this Order and the February 13th Order on Estes without prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/8/2018. (jak)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/29/2018. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trammell v. Carter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Trammell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?