Merold v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Richard L Merold, Jr
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2018cv00041
Filed: March 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying 23 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and granting Motion to extend time. Mr. Merold must file a notice of appeal no later than 3/25/2019. Plaintiff's motion for a "complaint form" is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 3/12/2019. (jak)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 21 Motion. Plaintiff's notice of appeal is due on or before 2/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 1/14/2019. (jak)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 JUDGMENT: Consistent with 19 Order that was entered on this day, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Judgment is entered in favor of the Commissioner. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/12/2018. (ljb)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting 1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to file and docket the Complaint, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor, and issue summons for Defendant, the U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of Arkansas, and the U.S. Attorney General. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, Complaint, and this Order without prepayment of fees and costs or the necessity of giving security. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 3/8/2018. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merold v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard L Merold, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?