Erwin v. Paragould Arkansas, City of et al

Plaintiff: David Erwin and John Does
Defendant: Paragould Arkansas, City of, Billy Mcgraw and Arkansas State Police
Case Number: 3:2018cv00073
Filed: April 16, 2018
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting as modified 10 Motion to reconsider. The Court reopens this case and vacates its 10 Judgment. The settlement with Paragould remains in force, as does the Court's dismissal without prejudice of Trooper McGraw. The official cap acity claims against Greene County Sheriff's Department are dismissed without prejudice. Erwin's complaint alleges unreasonable search and seizure. The Court construes these allegations as an individual-capacity claim against the unnamed d eputy sheriff who will be John Doe 4 for now. The Court directs the Clerk to update the docket. Erwin must provide a complete name and address for service as soon as he can, and no later than 7/27/2018. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/10/2018. (jak)
June 28, 2018 9 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/28/2018. (jak)
May 3, 2018 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Erwin is directed to provide addresses for the city and Trooper McGraw by 5/25/2018. Erwin doesn't know the names of the city officers so they will be John Does 1-3 for now. Erwin must provide their names, and their addresses for service, as soon as he can. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/3/2018. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erwin v. Paragould Arkansas, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Erwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paragould Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Mcgraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas State Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?