Murphy v. Arkansas, State of et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy W Murphy
Defendant: Tommy Folwer, Scott Ellington, State of Arkansas, Bowling, Craighead County Jail, Tommy Fowler, Does Jail Staff and Sheriff Department Staff, Arkansas, State of, Marty Boyd, David Boling and Craighead County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 3:2018cv00154
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER of USCA: The Clerk of the district court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER as to #11 Notice of Appeal filed by Jeremy W Murphy. (cmn)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER of USCA as to #11 Notice of Appeal filed by Jeremy W Murphy: The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to pay the fee in the district court or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of this order. (cmn)
October 1, 2018 Filing 15 USCA Docketing Letter as to #11 Notice of Appeal filed by Jeremy W Murphy. USCA Case Number 18-3087. (cmn)
September 27, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #13 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the document was filed in error (duplicate entry) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was previously filed as docket entry #12 Order. (jak)
September 27, 2018 Filing 14 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to #11 Notice of Appeal re #7 Order and #8 Judgment. (cmn)
September 27, 2018 Filing 13 DOCKET ENTRY FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD (kdr) (Docket text modified on 9/27/2018 to indicate the document was filed in error) (jak)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #10 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Within thirty days of the entry of this order, Murphy must either pay the full $505 appellate filing fee to the clerk or file with the Eighth Circuit an application to proceed in forma pauperis that complies with Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 24(a)(5). Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/27/2018. (fcd)
September 24, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #7 Order and #8 Judgment by Jeremy W Murphy. (cmn)
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Jeremy W Murphy. (cmn)
September 12, 2018 Filing 9 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (cmn)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGMENT: Consistent with #7 order, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/12/2018. (cmn)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER dismissing without prejudice Murphy's complaint; certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith; and counting this dismissal as a "strike". Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/12/2018. (cmn)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Plaintiff Jeremy W. Murphy's motion to proceed in forma pauperis; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the clerk to send a copy of this order to the Administrator of the Craighead County Detention Center. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/12/2018. (cmn)
August 30, 2018 Filing 5 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all Defendants, filed by Jeremy W Murphy. (cel)
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeremy W Murphy. (cel)
August 29, 2018 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all Defendants, filed by Jeremy W Murphy. (cel)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing Murphy to either pay the filing fee or file a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days of the date of this Order. Murphy also has 30 days in which to amend his #1 Complaint. The Clerk is directed to forward Murphy an in forma pauperis application packet as well as a 1983 Complaint form together with a copy of this Order. The Clerk is also directed to change the docket to reflect the correct spelling of Judge Fowler and Judge Boling's name. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/23/2018. (jak)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all Defendants filed by Jeremy W Murphy. (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Arkansas, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy W Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Folwer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Ellington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does Jail Staff and Sheriff Department Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Boling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?