Hardy v. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois et al
Plaintiff: Chester Hardy
Defendant: Does 1-10, Roe Corporations and Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Case Number: 3:2018cv00166
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 16 Letter to the Clerk for the Circuit Court of Crittenden County transmitting a copy of the case file and certified copies of #15 Order to Remand and the docket sheet via certified mail. (jak)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #6 Motion. Hardy's case is remanded to the Circuit Court of Crittenden County, Arkansas. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/12/2018. (jak)
October 10, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION by Chester Hardy. (Sumpter, Roger)
September 21, 2018 Filing 13 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #12 Response to Motion to Remand filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Koehler, David)
September 21, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Koehler, David)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion, No. #10 , granted. Chuck Gschwend and Ryan Wilson are relieved as counsel for Safeco. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/14/2018. (slb)
September 12, 2018 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and for Substitution of Counsel by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Koehler, David)
September 12, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart P. Miller on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Miller, Stuart)
September 12, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David Koehler on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Koehler, David)
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities re #6 Remand to State Court filed by Chester Hardy. (Sumpter, Roger)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Chester Hardy (Sumpter, Roger)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 RECEIPT FILED: $400.00, receipt number LIT068607. (alm)
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois.(jak)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (jak)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Chester Hardy.(jak)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois from Crittenden County Circuit Court, case number CV-2018-741. (Fee of $400 received) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardy v. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: Henry Charles Gschwend, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan M. Wilson
Represented By: Stuart P. Miller
Represented By: David Koehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chester Hardy
Represented By: Roger Dennis Sumpter, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?