Atteberry v. Marian et al
Plaintiff: David E Atteberry
Defendant: Stefan Marian and RSP Express Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv00191
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Stefan Marian, RSP Express Inc. Joint Rule 26(f) Report of the Parties Planning Meeting (Wyatt, Carl)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/7/2018. Jury Trial set for 3/9/2020 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) # 324 before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 10/23/2018. (slb)
October 14, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Stefan Marian, RSP Express Inc.(Wyatt, Carl)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl K. Wyatt, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Wyatt, Carl)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by RSP Express Inc. (kdr)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by David E Atteberry, Jr.(kdr)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RSP Express Inc from Missippi County Circuit Court, Case Number 47BCV-18-310. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT069140. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atteberry v. Marian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stefan Marian
Represented By: Carl K. Wyatt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSP Express Inc
Represented By: Carl K. Wyatt, Jr.
Represented By: Todd B. Murrah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David E Atteberry
Represented By: James W. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?