McDougal v. Craighead County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Anthony McDougal, Jr
Defendant: E Stanfield and Craighead County Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2018cv00203
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/20/2018. (kdr)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing monthly payments be collected from Plaintiff's institutional account, until a total of $350 has been paid to the Clerk of the Court; directing Plaintiff to file an amended complaint; directing the Clerk to mail Plaintiff the Court-provided 1983 Complaint form; and directing the Clerk to send a copy of this order to the Craighead County Detention Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/20/2018. (kdr)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony McDougal, Jr. (ljb)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing McDougal to either submit the $400 filing fee or an in forma pauperis motion within 30 days of the entry date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send to Plaintiff an in forma pauperis motion together with the filing fee calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/1/2018. (jak)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Anthony McDougal, Jr.(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDougal v. Craighead County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony McDougal, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Stanfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?