Vail v. Allen et al

Plaintiff: Matryne Dewitt Vail
Defendant: Mike Allen and Ron Coleman
Case Number: 3:2018cv00207
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
0 Judge: D P Marshall
1 Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 9 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Matryne Dewitt Vail re #8 Proposed Findings and Recommendations. (fjg)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's complaint be dismissed without prejudice for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted #1 . Dismissal of this action count as a "strike", for purposes of 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). The Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from any order adopting these recommendations would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/14/2018. (lej)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Matryne Dewitt Vail re 1983 complaint form. (fjg)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Matryne Dewitt Vail re #5 Order. (fjg)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit #2 . If Plaintiff wishes to amend his complaint, he may complete the new complaint form in its entirety in accordance with this order, mark it as "Amended Complaint," and file it within 30 days of the date of this order. Plaintiff's complaint, as it now stands, is deficient and may be recommended for dismissal after 30 days of the date of this order. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/13/2018. (lej)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 Case electronically transferred in from District of Arkansas Western; Case Number 5:18-cv-05219. Electronic file copy of transfer order, case file, and docket sheet received.
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Eastern District of Arkansas. Docket Sheet and case documents sent to receiving court. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on November 2, 2018. (lgd) [Transferred from arwd on 11/2/2018.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Matryne Dewitt Vail. Motions referred to Erin L. Wiedemann.(lgd) [Transferred from arwd on 11/2/2018.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Mike Allen, Ron Coleman, filed by Matryne Dewitt Vail.(lgd) [Transferred from arwd on 11/2/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vail v. Allen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matryne Dewitt Vail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?