Miller v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Debra Miller
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company and Duravent
Case Number: 3:2018cv00216
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2019 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company.(Dishman, Jodi)
December 20, 2018 9 ERISA SCHEDULING ORDER: The stipulated record shall be filed no later than 2/22/2019; plaintiff's brief shall be filed within 14 days thereafter; defendant's brief shall be filed within 14 days thereafter. No reply briefs will be allowed unless leave has been granted. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 12/20/18. (lp)
December 6, 2018 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Duravent by Debra Miller. (Lacy, Brandon)
December 5, 2018 7 Featured Case (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #6 motion to extend time. Responsive pleading or motion due 01/07/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/05/2018. (sj)
December 4, 2018 6 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company (Dishman, Jodi)
December 4, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jodi Warmbrod Dishman on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company (Dishman, Jodi)
November 26, 2018 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by Debra Miller. Duravent served on 11/19/2018. (Lacy, Brandon)
November 26, 2018 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by Debra Miller. Aetna Life Insurance Company served on 11/16/2018. (Lacy, Brandon)
November 13, 2018 2 RECEIPT FILED: $ 400.00, receipt number 069616. (llg)
November 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Debra Miller.(Fee of $400 received; Summons issued and returned to Plaintiff's counsel for service) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jodi Warmbrod Dishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duravent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Miller
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?