Anderson v. Driskill et al
Plaintiff: Tawona Warren Anderson
Defendant: Blytheville Arkansas, City of, Doyne Driskill and Ross A Thompson
Case Number: 3:2018cv00231
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 2/4/2019. Jury Trial set for 5/11/2020 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) # 324 before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 12/21/2018. (slb)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 RECEIPT FILED: $ 400.00, receipt number LIT069869. (llg)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Blytheville Arkansas, City of, Doyne Driskill, Ross A Thompson.(jak)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 EX PARTE EMERGENCY ORDER from the Circuit Court of Mississippi County Arkansas. (jak)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Tawona Warren Anderson.(jak)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Blytheville Arkansas, City of, Doyne Driskill, Ross A Thompson from Mississippi County Circuit Court, case number 47BCV-18-352. (Fee of $400 received) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Driskill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blytheville Arkansas, City of
Represented By: Jenna Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doyne Driskill
Represented By: Jenna Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross A Thompson
Represented By: Jenna Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tawona Warren Anderson
Represented By: Zachary W. Morrison
Represented By: James W. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?