Barker v. Allen et al

Plaintiff: Mark Barker
Defendant: Mike Allen and Ronnie Coleman
Case Number: 3:2019cv00006
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
0 Judge: Jerome T Kearney
1 Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #7 motion for copies. The clerk is directed to send the plaintiff a copy of the docket sheet and the proposed findings and recommendations #6 . Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 02/20/19. (sj)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Status Update and NOTICE of Change of Address by Mark Barker. (jak)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's complaint be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Objections due 14 days from the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/19/2019. (jak)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Mark Barker re 1983 Complaint form and Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis form. (jak)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Mark Barker re #2 Order. (fjg)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Mark Barker re #1 Complaint. (fjg)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing Barker to submit either the $400 filing fee or an in forma pauperis motion within 30 days of the entry date of this Order. Plaintiff is further directed to file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff an in forma pauperis motion together with the filing fee calculation sheet, and a 1983 complaint form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/9/2019. (jak)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Mark Barker. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barker v. Allen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?