Smith v. Poinsett County Detention Center et al

Plaintiff: Roger Dale Smith
Defendant: Doe, Poinsett County Detention Center, K Bowers and Craighead County Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2019cv00009
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jak)
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 JUDGMENT: Smith's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/12/2019. (jak)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER dismissing without prejudice Smith's complaint. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/12/2019. (jak)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Roger Dale Smith re #2 Notice of Docket Correction re #1 Complaint, #5 Order. (fjg)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Roger Dale Smith re IFP Application. (jak)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Roger Dale Smith re #3 Initial Order for Pro Se Plaintiffs. (fjg)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing Smith to either file an application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the filing and administrative fees by 3/1/2019. The Clerk is directed to mail Smith an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/30/2019. (jak)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Roger Dale Smith re #1 Complaint. (fjg)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/24/2019. (jak)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The original document was submitted in error - wrong image file. The correct document was added to #1 and hereto for service/review by the parties. (kbc)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Roger Dale Smith.(kdr) Additional attachment added on 1/15/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct. (kbc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Poinsett County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poinsett County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Dale Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?