Rush v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Brian Rush
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv00029
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Rush. Social Security Administration served on 2/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wallace, Stephanie)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/15/2019. (jak)
February 13, 2019 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Forwarded to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (jak)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting permission to proceed in forma pauperis #1 . The Clerk will issue summons without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/13/2019. (lej)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Brian Rush. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brian Rush. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rush v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Rush
Represented By: Stephanie Bartels Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?