Coleman v. Bowers et al
Plaintiff: James Edward Coleman
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center, T Raymond, Keith Bowers, Brown and Marty Boyd
Case Number: 3:2019cv00097
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Patricia S Harris
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 20 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to James Edward Coleman re #19 Proposed Findings and Recommendation. (fjg)
June 21, 2019 Filing 19 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that #2 Coleman's complaint be dismissed without prejudice. Objections due within 14 days of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 6/21/2019. (ljb)
June 6, 2019 Filing 18 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to James Edward Coleman re #17 Notice of Docket Correction re #15 Notice of Appearance and #16 Answer. (fjg)
May 23, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #15 Notice of Appearance and #16 Answer. CORRECTION: The original document were submitted in error (wrong image files). The correct documents were added to docket entries #15 and #16 based on the attached correspondence. (jak)
May 22, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Keith Bowers, Marty Boyd, T Raymond.(Davis, JaNan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/23/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct (submitted 5/23/2019)) (jak).
May 22, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by JaNan Arnold Davis on behalf of Keith Bowers, Marty Boyd, T Raymond (Davis, JaNan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/23/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct (submitted 5/23/2019)) (jak).
May 20, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed. T Raymond served on 5/13/2019. (fjg)
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Marty Boyd served on 5/13/2019. (fjg)
May 20, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Keith Bowers served on 5/13/2019. (fjg)
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to James Edward Coleman re 10 Text Entry Only Order. (fjg)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER. On 5/9/2019, mail sent to plaintiff Coleman at his address of record was returned as undeliverable. (Doc. No. #9 ). Accordingly, Coleman is directed to file a notice of his current mailing address no later than 30 days after this order's entry date. Plaintiff's failure to do so will result in the recommended dismissal of his complaint. Because the Arkansas Department of Correction's public website indicates plaintiff may be held at the Arkansas Department of Correction, East Arkansas Regional Unit, the Clerk is directed to send a copy of this order to plaintiff at his address of record, as well as Arkansas Department of Correction, East Arkansas Regional Unit, 326 Lee 601, Brickeys, Arkansas 72320-0180. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 5/9/2019. (cfd)
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to James Edward Coleman re #7 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommendation, #8 Order. (fjg)
April 29, 2019 Summons Issued as to Keith Bowers, Marty Boyd, T Raymond and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (cmn)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summonses for the Defendants Keith Bowers, Marty Boyd, and T. Raymond, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of #6 Amended Complaint and summons on them without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 4/29/2019. (jak)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND PARTIAL RECOMMENDATION recommending that Coleman's claims based on verbal remarks and racial bias be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; and that Coleman's claims against Brown be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Objections due within 14 days of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 4/29/2019. (ljb)
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by James Edward Coleman. (ljb)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing plaintiff to file an amended complaint conforming to this order within 30 days. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Coleman a blank 1983 form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 4/17/2019. (jak)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James Edward Coleman.(kdr)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS. Granting #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court does not assess an initial partial filing fee. Plaintiff's custodian is directed to collect monthly payments from his institutional account and forward those payments to the Clerk until a total of $350 has been paid. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Craighead County Sheriff. The Court will not order service of process at this time but instead orders Coleman to file an amended complaint regarding his claims within 30 day. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Coleman a blank 1983 form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 4/10/2019. (jak)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Craighead County Detention Center, filed by James Edward Coleman.(kdr)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Edward Coleman. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Bowers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edward Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Raymond
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Bowers
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Boyd
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?