Stearns v. Inmate Services Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Danzel L Stearns
Defendant: Christopher L Weiss, Doe, Inmate Services Corporation, Randy L Cagle, Jr and Ryan B Moore
Case Number: 3:2019cv00100
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Referring Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 RECEIPT FILED: $400.00, receipt number LIT071729 (original mailed). (llg)
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 E-MAIL received from Northern District of Ohio confirming the case was received and opened in their district as case number 1:19-cv-00828. (kbc)
April 15, 2019 Docket Note: Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of Ohio on 4/15/2019. (jbh)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to immediately transfer this case to the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/15/2019. (jbh)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to #5 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Billy Roy Wilson. (jak)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign this case to Judge Wilson. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/12/2019. (jak)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal. CORRECTION: The original civil cover sheet was submitted in error (wrong image file). The correct civil cover sheet was added as an attachment to docket entry #1 based on the attached correspondence. (jak)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Craighead County Circuit Judge Pam Honeycutt on 3/27/2019. (jak)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Danzel L Stearns.(jak)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Inmate Services Corporation from Crittenden County Circuit Court, case number 18CV-19-142. (Fee of $400 received) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/11/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet Main Document - Correct (submitted 4/11/2019)) (jak).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stearns v. Inmate Services Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher L Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inmate Services Corporation
Represented By: Mark Alan Mayfield
Represented By: Henry Charles Gschwend, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy L Cagle, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan B Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danzel L Stearns
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Represented By: Paul J. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?