Williams v. Craighead County Detention Center
Plaintiff: Timothy Martin Williams
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2019cv00101
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Referring Judge: J Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Timothy Martin Williams re #9 Order, #10 Judgment, #11 Appellate Filing Fee Notice. (fjg)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (kdr)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 JUDGMENT: Williams's complaint is dismissed without prejudice #9 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/25/2019. (kdr)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Court withdraws the reference. Williams hasn't filed an amended complaint; and his mail is now being returned undelivered. His complaint will therefore be dismissed without prejudice. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/25/2019. (kdr)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office (lack of file mark). The correct document was added to docket entry #7 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Timothy Martin Williams re 1983 Complaint Form. (jak) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/13/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Timothy Martin Williams re #5 Order. (fjg)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER striking #3 Addendum from the record. The Clerk is directed to mail Williams a 1983 complaint form that is labeled "Amended Complaint". Williams must file within 30 days of the date of this Order an amended complaint that complies with the instructions in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 4/24/2019. (jak)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Granting #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's custodian is directed to collect monthly payments from plaintiff's institutional account and forward them to the Clerk until a total of $350 has been paid. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Craighead County Detention Facility. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 4/19/2019. (jak)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 ADDENDUM to #2 Complaint filed by Timothy Martin Williams. (ljb)[STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD PER #5 ORDER] (jak)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Craighead County Detention Center filed by Timothy Martin Williams. (ljb)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timothy Martin Williams. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Martin Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?