Cornelious v. Craighead County Detention Center

Plaintiff: Jeffery William Cornelious
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2019cv00109
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Jeffery William Cornelious re #6 Order adopting Recommendation, #7 Judgment, #8 Appellate Filing Fee Notice. (fjg)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jak)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT: Cornelious's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/13/2019. (jak)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER adopting #4 Recommendation. Cornelious's complaint will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. This dismissal counts as a "strike" and an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/13/2019. (jak)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Jeffery William Cornelious re #4 Proposed Findings and Recommendations. (fjg)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the complaint be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted #2 . Dismissal of this action count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). The Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from an order adopting this recommendation and the accompanying judgment would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 5/20/2019. (lej)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees #1 . Service is not appropriate at this time. If Plaintiff wishes to amend his complaint, he may complete the new complaint form in its entirety in accordance with this order, mark it as "Amended Complaint," and file it within 30 days of the date of this order. Plaintiff's complaint, as it now stands, is deficient and may be dismissed after 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/16/2019. (lej)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Craighead County Detention Center filed by Jeffery William Cornelious. (ljb)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeffery William Cornelious. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cornelious v. Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery William Cornelious
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?