Everling v. Craighead County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: James Everling
Defendant: Doe, T Ramond, Keith Bowers, Craighead County Detention Center and Craighead County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00151
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Patricia S Harris
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER. Plaintiff, a former resident at Craighead County Detention Facility, filed a pro se complaint (Doc. No. #1 ) pursuant to 42.US.C. 1983, on 5/16/2019, and was granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). (Doc. No. #4 ). Plaintiff filed a change of address notice indicating that he has now been released from custody. (Doc. No. #6 ). When a plaintiff is released from confinement, the Court's policy is to require re-submission of affidavits to determine whether he should be required to pay all, or a portion of, the fees and costs of the lawsuit. If plaintiff wishes to proceed with this lawsuit, he is directed to pay the $350.00 filing fee, or to resubmit an IFP application which reflects his free-world financial status, no later than 30 days after the entry date of this order. Plaintiff's failure to do so will result in the recommended dismissal of this lawsuit. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT: the Clerk is directed to forward an IFP application to plaintiff; plaintiff is directed to submit the remainder of his $350.00 filing fee, or to complete and sign the IFP application, and file it, no later than 30 days after the entry date of this order. Plaintiff's failure to do so will result in the recommended dismissal of his complaint.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 7/3/2019. (cfd)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by James Everling. (cmn)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE filed by James Everling. (ljb)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS. Directing the Clerk of Court to send plaintiff an IFP application along with a copy of this Order. Plaintiff must return a completed IFP application or pay the $400 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 5/21/2019. (jak)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #2 Notice of Filing Fee Calculation Sheet. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office (lack of file mark). The correct document was added to docket entry #2 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Calculation Sheet and Certificate of Prisoner Account by James Everling. (llg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by James Everling. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Everling v. Craighead County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Everling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Ramond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?