Amy Logistics LLC v. Great West Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Amy Logistics LLC
Defendant: Great West Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00166
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 JUDGMENT: The amended complaint is dismissed with prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction until 7/31/2019 to enforce the parties settlement. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/1/2019. (jak)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: The parties have settled. No. #10 . Congratulations. The Court will dismiss and retain jurisdiction for a time to enforce the settlement. Motion to dismiss, No. #3 , denied without prejudice as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/1/2019. (jak)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement by Great West Casualty Company (Tom, Robert)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Amy Logistics LLC. (Elmore, Phillip)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Amy Logistics LLC(Elmore, Phillip)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion, No. #6 , granted. Mr. Zachary A. Kisber is admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/17/2019. (slb)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Zachary A. Kisber. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3478539. Filed by Great West Casualty Company (Tom, Robert)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 RECEIPT FILED: $400.00, receipt number LIT072555. (Original receipt mailed.) (rmg)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM re #3 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Great West Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Commercial Lines Policy)(Tom, Robert)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Great West Casualty Company (Tom, Robert)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment & Damages with Jury Demand against Great West Casualty Company, filed by Amy Logistics LLC.(jak)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Great West Casualty Company from Mississippi County Circuit Court, case number 470cv-19-43. (Fee of $400 received) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amy Logistics LLC v. Great West Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Logistics LLC
Represented By: Phillip Anthony Elmore
Represented By: Vincent O. Chadick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great West Casualty Company
Represented By: Robert F. Tom
Represented By: Zachary A. Kisber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?