Mastercraft Distribution USA Inc v. Safavieh Intl LLC
Plaintiff: Mastercraft Distribution USA Inc
Defendant: Safavieh Intl LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00186
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion, No. #6 , granted. Mark S. Kaufman is admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 08/14/2019. (crw)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Mark Kaufman. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3517712. Filed by Safavieh Intl LLC (Attachments: #1 Document)(Bartolomei, James)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, No. #4 , granted. Answer or Rule 12(b) motion due by 29 August 2019. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 08/12/2019. (crw)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint by Safavieh Intl LLC (Attachments: #1 Document Proposed Order Approving Motion to Extend time to respond to the Complaint)(Bartolomei, James)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James Henry Bartolomei, III on behalf of Safavieh Intl LLC (Bartolomei, James)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright forwarded to the Register of Copyrights, U.S. Copyright office, by the Clerk of Court. (thd)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Safavieh Intl LLC, filed by Mastercraft Distribution USA Inc. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT072772. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mastercraft Distribution USA Inc v. Safavieh Intl LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safavieh Intl LLC
Represented By: Mark S. Kaufman
Represented By: James Henry Bartolomei, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mastercraft Distribution USA Inc
Represented By: Gary N. Speed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?