Preston v. Draughn et al
Plaintiff: Derenzo Deshon Preston
Defendant: Nicholas L Naracon, Alex Draughn, Wendy Kelly and Misty White
Case Number: 3:2019cv00190
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Patricia S Harris
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jak)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT: Preston's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/6/2019. (jak)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER withdrawing the reference. Preston's complaint will be dismissed without prejudice. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/6/2019. (jak)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS denying without prejudice #2 IFP application. The Clerk of Court is directed to enclose an IFP application including an accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay the $400 filing and administrative fees within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 7/2/2019. (jak)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Case electronically transferred in from District of Arkansas Western; Case Number 6:19-cv-06077. Electronic file copy of transfer order, case file, and docket sheet received.
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of Eastern District of Arkansas. Docket Sheet and case documents sent to receiving court. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 28, 2019. (mjm) [Transferred from arwd on 6/28/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Derenzo Deshon Preston. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(mjm) [Transferred from arwd on 6/28/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Alex Draughn, Wendy Kelly, Nicholas L. Naracon, Misty White, filed by Derenzo Deshon Preston.(mjm) [Transferred from arwd on 6/28/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Preston v. Draughn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas L Naracon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Draughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Misty White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derenzo Deshon Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?