Jetton General Contracting Inc v. Cunningham
Plaintiff: Jetton General Contracting Inc
Defendant: Kevin Cunningham
Case Number: 3:2019cv00191
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by Jetton General Contracting Inc. (Peoples, Ashley)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement by Jetton General Contracting Inc (Peoples, Ashley)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff has until August 23, 2019 to respond to the counterclaim. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/15/19. (dpb)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Counterclaim by Jetton General Contracting Inc (Peoples, Ashley)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 9/11/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/25/2019. Proposed Jury Trial date set for week of 5/4/2020 at 9:15 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 7/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order) (cdw)
July 5, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #3 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to establish linkage to #2 Complaint as marked on the document.(cmn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Jetton General Contracting Inc by Kevin Cunningham.(Arnold, William) (Docket text modified on 7/5/2019 to establish linkage.)(cmn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 VERIFIED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Kevin Cunningham filed by Jetton General Contracting Inc. (ljb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kevin Cunningham from Greene County Circuit Court, Case Number CV2019-129. Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT072863. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jetton General Contracting Inc v. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jetton General Contracting Inc
Represented By: Ashley D. Peoples
Represented By: Breanna R. Trombley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Cunningham
Represented By: William Allen Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?