Huff v. Preferred Family Healthcare Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Randal Huff, Kelli Ledbetter, Tina Samuels, Myria Harmon and Jane Pitcher
Defendant: Quapaw House Inc and Preferred Family Healthcare Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv00193
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join -- Ruth Ann Carpenter (Sanford, Joshua)
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Quapaw House Inc.(Blackstock, Clayton)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Myria Harmon, Randal Huff, Kelli Ledbetter, Jane Pitcher, Tina Samuels Consent to Join -- Kenya Liddell (Sanford, Joshua)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED and Substituted Complaint-Collective Action against Preferred Family Healthcare Incorporated, Quapaw House Inc, filed by Randal Huff, with newly added plaintiffs: Tina Samuels, Myria Harmon, Jane Pitcher, Kelli Ledbetter (jap)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Randal Huff Consent to Join -- Tina Samuels (Sanford, Joshua)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Randal Huff Consent to Join -- Jane Pitcher (Sanford, Joshua)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 10/8/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 10/21/2019; Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 8/17/2020 at 09:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) # 324 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 8/1/19. (rmg)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Clayton R. Blackstock on behalf of Quapaw House Inc (Blackstock, Clayton)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Quapaw House Inc (Blackstock, Clayton)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Quapaw House Inc.(Blackstock, Clayton)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #3 Notice of Consent. CORRECTION: The original document did not auto populate the CM/ECF header information on the document when filed electronically. The correct document was added to docket entry #3 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Randal Huff Consents to Join -- Myria Harmon and Kellie Letbetter (Sanford, Joshua) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Randal Huff. Quapaw House Inc served on 7/10/2019. (Sanford, Joshua)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT-COLLECTIVE ACTION against All Defendants filed by Randal Huff. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT072911.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huff v. Preferred Family Healthcare Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quapaw House Inc
Represented By: Clayton R. Blackstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Family Healthcare Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randal Huff
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Daniel D. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelli Ledbetter
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Daniel D. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Samuels
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Daniel D. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myria Harmon
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Daniel D. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Pitcher
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Daniel D. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?