Newsom v. Wright Medical Technology Inc et al
Plaintiff: Charles E Newsom
Defendant: Wright Medical Group Inc, Wright Medical Technology Inc and John Does
Case Number: 3:2019cv00196
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand /Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to First Amended Complaint for Damages by Wright Medical Technology Inc.(Irby, Scott)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Andrew Irby on behalf of Wright Medical Technology Inc (Irby, Scott)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean K. Burke on behalf of Wright Medical Technology Inc (Burke, Sean)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana J. Ash on behalf of Wright Medical Technology Inc (Ash, Dana)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Charles E Newsom. Wright Medical Technology Inc served on 8/8/2019. (Wells, Robert)
August 1, 2019 Summons Reissued as to Wright Medical Technology Inc. Returned to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (jak)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Does, Wright Medical Technology Inc, filed by Charles E Newsom (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit)(Wells, Robert)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Charles E Newsom. Wright Medical Technology Inc served on 7/16/2019. (Wells, Robert)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 RECEIPT FILED: $400, receipt number LIT073032 (bmd)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Charles E Newsom. (Fee of $400 received; Summons issued and returned to Plaintiff's counsel) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newsom v. Wright Medical Technology Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E Newsom
Represented By: Phillip J. Wells
Represented By: Robert Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Inc
Represented By: Dana J. Ash
Represented By: Sean K. Burke
Represented By: Scott Andrew Irby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?