Vinson v. Ramey et al
Plaintiff: Glenn Vinson
Defendant: Steve Rorex and Doyle Ramey
Case Number: 3:2019cv00222
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Glenn Vinson re #2 Initial Order for Pro Se Prisoner-Plaintiffs, IFP application. (fjg)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION that Mr. Vinson's claims be dismissed, without prejudice, based on his failure to notify the Court of his current address, as required by court rules and #4 Order. Objections due within 14 days of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/30/2019. (csf)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Glenn Vinson re #4 Order re #3 Mail Returned. (fjg)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #3 Mail Returned. Mr. Vinson is directed to notify the Court of his new address within 30 days of entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/26/2019. (csf)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Glenn Vinson re #1 Complaint, #2 Initial Order for Pro Se Prisoner-Plaintiffs. (fjg)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS directing the Clerk of Court to enclose an application to proceed IFP and a jail account information sheet along with a copy of this Order; directing Plaintiff to return a completed IFP application, including an accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay the $400.00 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/13/2019. (jbh)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Glenn Vinson. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vinson v. Ramey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Rorex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doyle Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Vinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?