Walker v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Michael Walker, Jr
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv00223
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Patricia S Harris
Referring Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Walker, Jr. Social Security Administration served on 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wallace, Stephanie)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/22/2019. (jak)
August 14, 2019 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Forwarded to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (jak)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court shall issue summonses to plaintiff, and plaintiff is directed to serve the appropriate parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 8/14/2019. (jak)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Michael Walker, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Walker, Jr. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Walker, Jr
Represented By: Stephanie Bartels Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?