Harris v. Morphis
Plaintiff: Lawrence Isiah Harris
Defendant: Cassy Morphis
Case Number: 3:2019cv00225
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jbh)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JUDGMENT: Consistent with the #5 order entered today, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/11/2019. (jbh)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER adopting #4 proposed findings and recommendations from United States Magistrate Judge Jerome J. Kearney. The case is dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/11/2019. (jbh)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's complaint be dismissed without prejudice, for failure to prosecute. Objections due 14 days from the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/23/2019. (jak)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying without prejudice #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall either submit either the $400 statutory filing fee or a completed in forma pauperis application within 30 days of the entry date of this Order. The Clerk shall send to Plaintiff an in forma pauperis application and calculation sheet. The Clerk also shall forward a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Craighead County Detention Facility. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/20/2019. (jak)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Cassy Morphis, filed by Lawrence Isiah Harris.(kdr)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lawrence Isiah Harris. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Morphis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Isiah Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassy Morphis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?