Washam v. BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: Bradley Washam
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00231
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Benjamin C. Burns. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3559747. Filed by BNSF Railway Company (Kostakis, Brooks)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Chad M. Knight. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3559734. Filed by BNSF Railway Company (Kostakis, Brooks)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by BNSF Railway Company (Reifers, Stephanie)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand and Defenses by BNSF Railway Company.(Reifers, Stephanie)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooks E. Kostakis on behalf of BNSF Railway Company (Kostakis, Brooks)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Camille Reifers on behalf of BNSF Railway Company (Reifers, Stephanie)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of the Complaint, filed by Bradley Washam. BNSF Railway Company served on 8/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Wolff, Nelson)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee received $400.00, Receipt # LIT073592. (fjg)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Bradley Washam (Fee of $400 received; Summons issued and returned to Plaintiff's counsel). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washam v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Stephanie Camille Reifers
Represented By: Chad M. Knight
Represented By: Brooks E. Kostakis
Represented By: Benjamin C. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Washam
Represented By: Nelson Gregory Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?