Chandler v. Carney
Plaintiff: Michael Scott Chandler
Defendant: Eric A Carney
Case Number: 3:2019cv00235
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 6/7/2021 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Discovery due by 1/8/2021. Motions due by 2/8/2021. Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 5/6/2021. Signed at the direction of the Court on 10/15/2019. (slb)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Eric A Carney. (Helmick, Emily)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Rae Helmick on behalf of Eric A Carney (Helmick, Emily)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 11/20/2019. Jury Trial set for 6/7/2021 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 10/4/2019. (slb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee received $400.00, Receipt # LIT073593. (fjg)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Eric A Carney. (jak)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Eric A Carney.(jak)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Michael Scott Chandler.(jak)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Eric A Carney from Mississippi County Circuit Court, case number 470CV-19-66. (Fee of $400 received) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chandler v. Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric A Carney
Represented By: John E. Moore
Represented By: Emily Rae Helmick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Scott Chandler
Represented By: Jim L. Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?