Moody v. Ramey et al
Plaintiff: Michal A Moody
Defendant: Steve Rorex and Doyle Ramey
Case Number: 3:2019cv00236
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Michal A Moody re #5 Order. (fjg)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Michael A Moody re 1983 Complaint form. (jak)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Michal A Moody re #6 Initial Order for Pro Se Prisoners. (fjg)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 09/16/2019. (lmc)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350 for this action. Plaintiff's custodian is directed to collect monthly payments from his prison trust account and forward them to the Clerk until a total of $350 has been collected. Plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint within 30 days from the date of this Order. The Clerk shall mail plaintiff the 1983 complaint form. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Poinsett County Detention Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/16/2019. (jak)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michal A Moody. (kdr)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing Plaintiff Moody to submit either the $400 statutory filing fee or an in forma pauperis motion, within 30 days of the entry date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send to Plaintiff an In Forma Pauperis Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/29/2019. (jak)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Certificate of Inmate Account by Michal A Moody. (llg)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Michal A Moody. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moody v. Ramey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Rorex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doyle Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michal A Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?