Pittman v. Nice-Pak Products Inc
Plaintiff: Eddie LaReece Pittman
Defendant: Nice-Pak Products Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00239
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Nice-Pak Products Inc served on 10/10/2019. (ajt)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying without prejudice #6 Motion. After Nice-Pak appears, Pittman should confer with the company's lawyers about mailings. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/22/2019. (jak)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to be Heard by Eddie LaReece Pittman (jap)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/18/2019. (jak)
September 20, 2019 Summons Issued as to Nice-Pak Products Inc. Forwarded to USMS for service. (kdr)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The Court dismisses without prejudice Pittman's claim of discrimination due to criminal history. He hasn't pleaded a statistics-based disparate impact on members of his race. Pittman has a plausible race-based discrimination claim. The Court directs the Clerk to prepare a summons for Nice-Pak using the address provided by Pittman. And the Court directs the U.S. Marshal for the Eastern District of Arkansas to serve the summons and complaint without prepayment of fees. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/20/2019. (jak)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER pursuant to General Order 29 provisionally granted the application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/26/2019. (jak)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT under Title VII of the Civil Rights Act of 1964 against Nice-Pak Products Inc, filed by Eddie LaReece Pittman.(jak)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eddie LaReece Pittman. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pittman v. Nice-Pak Products Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie LaReece Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nice-Pak Products Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?