Butler v. Boyde et al
Plaintiff: Mark Butler
Defendant: Marty Boyde, Brown and Keith Bowwers
Case Number: 3:2019cv00256
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jak)
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 JUDGMENT: Butler's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/12/2019. (jak)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER adopting #5 & #8 Recommendation and supplement. Butler's complaint will be dismissed without prejudice. #4 and #6 Motions for leave to proceed in forma pauperis are denied as moot. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/12/2019. (jak)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Mark Butler re #7 Order, #8 Supplemental Proposed Findings and Recommendations. (fjg)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending Plaintiff's Motions to #4 Proceed in forma pauperis and to #6 Reopen the Case be denied; recommending that, should Plaintiff wish to continue this case, he be required to submit the statutory filing fee of $350.00 to the Clerk, within 10 days of the date of this Order, together with a motion to reopen the case; and recommending that Plaintiff's Complaint be dismissed without prejudice. Objections due within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/22/2019. (jbh)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER returning this case to the Magistrate Judge for a supplemental recommendation on whether the facts in Butler's new paper, No. #6 , meet the imminent danger exception. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/21/2019. (jak)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Reopen Case by Mark Butler. (kdr)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that #4 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis be denied. Should plaintiff wish to continue this case, he should be required to submit the statutory filing fee of $350 to the Clerk within 10 days of the date of this Order, together with a motion to reopen the case. Plaintiff's complaint should be dismissed without prejudice Objections due 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/7/2019. (jak)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mark Butler. (kdr)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying without prejudice #1 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall either submit the $400 statutory filing fee or a completed in forma pauperis application within 30 days from the date of this Order. The Clerk shall send Plaintiff an IFP Application and calculation sheet. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/23/2019. (jak)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Mark Butler. (ljb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mark Butler. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Boyde et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Boyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Bowwers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?