Ellis v. Richardson et al
Plaintiff: Marlania Ellis
Defendant: Joseph Richardson and M&M Bedding LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00258
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 JUDGMENT: The complaint is dismissed with prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction until 11/15/2019 to enforce the settlement. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/11/2019. (jbh)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: The parties have settled. Congratulations. Joint motion, No. #9 , granted. The Court will dismiss the case with prejudice and retain jurisdiction for a time to enforce the settlement. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/11/2019. (slb)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by M&M Bedding LLC, Joseph Richardson (Owens, Daniel)
October 8, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #8 Notice. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document as follows, "AMENDED #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by M&M Bedding LLC, Joseph Richardson" as marked on the document. (cmn)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by M&M Bedding LLC, Joseph Richardson (Owens, Daniel) (Docket text modified on 10/8/2019 to correct description.)(cmn)
September 27, 2019 Summons Issued as to Joseph Richardson. Returned to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (jak)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Court notes the defendants' #1 Notice of Removal. But there is some jurisdictional fogginess. The notice is unclear about the citizenship of M&M Bedding's members. Who are they and where are they domiciled? Does complete diversity exist? Notice (joint or separate) due by 10/8/2019. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/25/2019. (jak)
September 24, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #3 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include reference to the Jury demand as marked on the document. (jak)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by M&M Bedding LLC (Owens, Daniel)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John Carter Fairley on behalf of M&M Bedding LLC and Joseph Richardson. (kdr)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Reece Owens on behalf of M&M Bedding LLC and Joseph Richardson. (kdr)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by M&M Bedding LLC and Joseph Richardson.(kdr)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Marlania Ellis.(kdr)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by M&M Bedding LLC and Joseph Richardson from Greene County Circuit Court, Case Number 28CV-2019-230. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT073999. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. Richardson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlania Ellis
Represented By: Jordan Shelby Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Richardson
Represented By: John Carter Fairley
Represented By: Daniel Reece Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&M Bedding LLC
Represented By: John Carter Fairley
Represented By: Daniel Reece Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?