Boothe Farms Inc et al v. Dow Chemical Co et al
Plaintiff: Terry Boothe, Jeffrey D Boothe, Big Risk Farms Inc, Boothe Farms Inc, Adam Boothe, Rinehart Family Farms II, Jason R Hanks and MM Family Farms
Defendant: E I Du Pont De Nemours and Co, Dow Chemical Co, Dow Agrosciences LLC and Corteva Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00264
Filed: September 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE by Corteva Inc, Dow Agrosciences LLC, Dow Chemical Co, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Co Firm Name Change and Email Contact Change (Johnson, Ross)
January 31, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #42 Final Scheduling Order. CORRECTION: The main document was not submitted during docketing due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The document has been added to #42 and hereto for service/review by the parties. (kbc)
January 31, 2020 Filing 42 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/14/2022 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Discovery due by 5/14/2021. Motions due by 7/14/2021. Signed at the direction of the Court on 1/31/2020. (slb) (kbc). Docket entry modified on 1/31/2020 to attach main document. (kbc)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Joint 26(f) report, No. #39 , noted. The Court approves the agreed discovery parameters, No. #39 at 23, and the proposed briefing schedule. For deadlines, the Court prefers dates certain, but recognizes the complexity of the case. Bi-monthly status reports will be sufficient. A Final Scheduling Order with a new trial date and deadlines will issue. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/31/2020. (slb)
January 24, 2020 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Mandler, John)
January 17, 2020 Filing 39 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Big Risk Farms Inc, Adam Boothe, Jeffrey D Boothe, Terry Boothe, Boothe Farms Inc, Jason R Hanks, MM Family Farms, Rinehart Family Farms II. Joint Rule 26(F) Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Smaistrla, Clayton)
January 10, 2020 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Smaistrla, Clayton)
December 12, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane A. Anderson on behalf of Corteva Inc, Dow Agrosciences LLC, Dow Chemical Co, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Co (Anderson, Shane)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Joint motion, No. #30 , granted as modified. Response to motion, No. #20 , due by 10 January 2020. Defendants may reply within 14 days of the response. Answer, or Rule 12(b) motion, responding to any amended complaint also due by 10 January 2020. In the future, any moving party may reply within seven calendar days of a response. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/6/2019. (slb)
December 6, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Ross W. Johnson on behalf of Corteva Inc, Dow Agrosciences LLC, Dow Chemical Co, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Co (Johnson, Ross)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motions, Nos. #32 & #33 , granted. Mr. Ross W. Johnson and Mr. Shane A. Anderson are admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/6/2019. (slb) (Docket text modified on 12/9/2019 to correct a typographical error)(jak)
December 5, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Shane A. Anderson. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3593048. Filed by Corteva Inc, Dow Agrosciences LLC, Dow Chemical Co, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Co (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Shane Anderson, #2 Document Certificate of Good Standing)(Tull, John)
December 5, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Ross W. Johnson. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3592895. Filed by Corteva Inc, Dow Agrosciences LLC, Dow Chemical Co, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Co (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ross W. Johnson, #2 Document Certificate of Good Standing)(Tull, John)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motions, Nos. #28 & #29 , granted. Mr. Stephen B. Murray, Jr. and Mr. Arthur M. Murray are admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/5/2019. (slb)
December 4, 2019 Filing 30 Joint MOTION to Extend Time by All Plaintiffs (Smaistrla, Clayton)
December 4, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Arthur M. Murray. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3591793. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Document Certificates of Good Standing)(Smaistrla, Clayton)
December 4, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Stephen B. Murray, Jr.. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3591775. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Document Certificates of Good Standing)(Smaistrla, Clayton)
December 3, 2019 Filing 27 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/17/2020. Jury Trial set for 5/10/2021 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 12/3/2019. (slb)
November 22, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #26 Notice of Appearance. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the attorney entering appearance as Charles Banks as marked on the document. (jak)
November 21, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Banks on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Smaistrla, Clayton) (Docket text modified on 11/22/2019 to correct the attorney entering appearance). (jak)
November 21, 2019 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by E I Du Pont De Nemours and Co (Keller, Thomas)
November 21, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Dow Chemical Co (Keller, Thomas)
November 21, 2019 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Dow Agrosciences LLC (Keller, Thomas)
November 21, 2019 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Corteva Inc (Keller, Thomas)
November 21, 2019 Filing 21 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #20 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Corteva Inc, Dow Agrosciences LLC, Dow Chemical Co, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Co. (Keller, Thomas)
November 21, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss by Corteva Inc, Dow Agrosciences LLC, Dow Chemical Co, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Co (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Keller, Thomas)
November 6, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Christoph Keller on behalf of Dow Chemical Co (Keller, Thomas)
November 6, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Tull, III on behalf of Dow Chemical Co (Tull, John)
November 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by E. B. Chiles, IV on behalf of Dow Chemical Co (Chiles, E.)
November 6, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Mandler on behalf of All Defendants (Mandler, John)
October 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #11 , #12 , #13 , and #14 Summons Returned Executed. CORRECTION: The original documents were submitted in error (lack of file marks) due to a Clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct documents were added to docket entries #11 , #12 , #13 , and #14 and are attached hereto for review by the parties. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned, #2 Summons Returned, #3 Summons Returned)(jak)
October 24, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Dow Chemical Co served on 10/1/2019. (jak) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
October 24, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Dow Agrosciences LLC served on 10/1/2019. (jak) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Corteva Inc served on 10/1/2019. (jak) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. E I Du Pont De Nemours and Co served on 10/1/2019. (jak) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Tull, III on behalf of Corteva Inc, Dow Agrosciences LLC, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Co (Tull, John)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by E. B. Chiles, IV on behalf of Corteva Inc, Dow Agrosciences LLC, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Co (Chiles, E.)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, No. #6 , granted. Answer or Rule 12(b) motion due by 21 November 2019. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/23/2019. (slb)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motions, Nos. #3 & #4 , denied without prejudice. The Court prefers designation of an attorney who maintains an office in Arkansas. Local Rule 83.5(d), para. 2. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/23/2019. (slb)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Corteva Inc, Dow Agrosciences LLC, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Co (Keller, Thomas)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Christoph Keller on behalf of Corteva Inc, Dow Agrosciences LLC, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Co (Keller, Thomas)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Stephen B. Murray, Jr.. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3563108. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Smaistrla, Clayton)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Arthur M. Murray. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3563068. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificates of Good Standing)(Smaistrla, Clayton)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 RECEIPT FILED: $400, receipt number LIT074119 (bmd)
September 26, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Adam Boothe, Big Risk Farms Inc, Boothe Farms Inc, MM Family Farms, Jeffrey D Boothe, Terry Boothe, Jason R Hanks, Rinehart Family Farms II. (Fee of $400 received; Summons issued and returned to Plaintiff's counsel for service). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boothe Farms Inc et al v. Dow Chemical Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Boothe
Represented By: Jessica W. Hayes
Represented By: Arthur M. Murray
Represented By: Clayton J. Smaistrla
Represented By: James J. Pizzirusso
Represented By: Stephen B. Murray, Jr.
Represented By: Charles A. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey D Boothe
Represented By: Jessica W. Hayes
Represented By: Arthur M. Murray
Represented By: Clayton J. Smaistrla
Represented By: James J. Pizzirusso
Represented By: Stephen B. Murray, Jr.
Represented By: Charles A. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big Risk Farms Inc
Represented By: Jessica W. Hayes
Represented By: Arthur M. Murray
Represented By: Clayton J. Smaistrla
Represented By: James J. Pizzirusso
Represented By: Stephen B. Murray, Jr.
Represented By: Charles A. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boothe Farms Inc
Represented By: Jessica W. Hayes
Represented By: Arthur M. Murray
Represented By: Clayton J. Smaistrla
Represented By: James J. Pizzirusso
Represented By: Stephen B. Murray, Jr.
Represented By: Charles A. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Boothe
Represented By: Jessica W. Hayes
Represented By: Arthur M. Murray
Represented By: Clayton J. Smaistrla
Represented By: James J. Pizzirusso
Represented By: Stephen B. Murray, Jr.
Represented By: Charles A. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rinehart Family Farms II
Represented By: Jessica W. Hayes
Represented By: Arthur M. Murray
Represented By: Clayton J. Smaistrla
Represented By: James J. Pizzirusso
Represented By: Stephen B. Murray, Jr.
Represented By: Charles A. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason R Hanks
Represented By: Jessica W. Hayes
Represented By: Arthur M. Murray
Represented By: Clayton J. Smaistrla
Represented By: James J. Pizzirusso
Represented By: Stephen B. Murray, Jr.
Represented By: Charles A. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MM Family Farms
Represented By: Jessica W. Hayes
Represented By: Arthur M. Murray
Represented By: Clayton J. Smaistrla
Represented By: James J. Pizzirusso
Represented By: Stephen B. Murray, Jr.
Represented By: Charles A. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E I Du Pont De Nemours and Co
Represented By: Thomas Christoph Keller
Represented By: John P. Mandler
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Represented By: Shane A. Anderson
Represented By: Ross W. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow Chemical Co
Represented By: Thomas Christoph Keller
Represented By: John P. Mandler
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Represented By: Shane A. Anderson
Represented By: Ross W. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow Agrosciences LLC
Represented By: Thomas Christoph Keller
Represented By: John P. Mandler
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Represented By: Shane A. Anderson
Represented By: Ross W. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva Inc
Represented By: Thomas Christoph Keller
Represented By: John P. Mandler
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Represented By: Shane A. Anderson
Represented By: Ross W. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?