Webster v. Ebbert
Plaintiff: Gary Leon Webster
Defendant: Jay Ebbert
Case Number: 3:2019cv00272
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ajt)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 JUDGMENT: Pursuant to #3 Order filed on this date, plaintiff Gary Leon Webster's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 11/26/2019. (ajt)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER dismissing without prejudice #1 complaint. Mr. Webster has 30 days from the date of this order to reopen this case by paying the $400 filing fee in full. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order or the accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 11/26/2019. (ajt)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to instructions from the Court, this case is transferred to the docket of Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 11/15/2019. (jak)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jay Ebbert filed by Gary Leon Webster. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webster v. Ebbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Leon Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Ebbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?