Murphy v. Simpkins et al
Plaintiff: Granville Murphy
Defendant: Jason Simpkins, Micheal Harrison, Ricky Jefferson and Ross Thompson
Case Number: 3:2019cv00283
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER of USCA as to 7 Notice of Appeal filed by Granville Murphy: On the Court's own motion, the deadline to resolve the pending fee matter is hereby extended. The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to pay the fee in the district court or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. (ajt)
December 2, 2019 Filing 17 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Granville Murphy re #6 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis, 7 Notice of Appeal. (fjg)
November 13, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #15 Letter. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office (lack of case number). The correct document was added to docket entry #15 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
November 12, 2019 Filing 15 Letter requesting status update filed by Granville Murphy. (ajt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER of USCA as to 7 Notice of Appeal filed by Granville Murphy: The Clerk of the district court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER. (ajt)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER of USCA as to 7 Notice of Appeal filed by Granville Murphy: The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to pay the fee in the district court or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of this order. (ajt)
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 USCA Docketing Letter as to 7 Notice of Appeal filed by Granville Murphy. USCA Case Number 19-3387. (ajt)
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Granville Murphy. (ajt)
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to 7 Notice of Appeal re #3 Order and #4 Judgment. (ajt)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #6 Motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/04/2019. (ajt)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Calculation Sheet and Certificate of Prisoner Account by Granville Murphy. (jbh)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Order and #4 Judgment by Granville Murphy. (No separate document attached; see #6 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis.) (ajt)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Granville Murphy. (ajt)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jak)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 JUDGMENT: Murphy's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/23/2019. (jak)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Murphy must pay the filing fee but over time. The Court won't assess an initial partial filing fee, but Murphy's custodian is directed to collect monthly payments from his prison trust account and forward them to the Clerk of the Court until the total 350 filing fee is paid in full. The Court directs the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Mississippi County Detention Center. Murphy's claims must be dismissed as Heck-barred. Murphy's complaint will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. This dismissal counts as a "strike" for purposes of 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/23/2019.(jak)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Granville Murphy.(kdr)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Granville Murphy. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Simpkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Granville Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Simpkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micheal Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?