Anderson v. Principal Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Cherie Anderson
Defendant: Principal Life Insurance Company, Interventional Pain Management Center, Baptist Medcare Inc, Baptist Health/Practice Plus and Baptist Health
Case Number: 3:2019cv00310
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12111
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, No. #7 , granted. Principal Life Insurance Company's answer or Rule 12(b) motion due by 3 January 2020. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/13/2019. (slb)
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Amended Complaint, or otherwise plead by Principal Life Insurance Company (Kersting, Edna)
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Edna Sybil Kersting on behalf of Principal Life Insurance Company (Kersting, Edna)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint, by Baptist Health, Baptist Health/Practice Plus, Baptist Medcare Inc.(Freeland, Byron)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Byron L. Freeland on behalf of Baptist Health, Baptist Health/Practice Plus, Baptist Medcare Inc (Freeland, Byron)
November 14, 2019 Summons Issued as to Baptist Health, Baptist Health/Practice Plus, Baptist Medcare Inc, Principal Life Insurance Company. Returned to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (jak)
November 12, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #2 First Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include "Summons not issued". (thd)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 RECEIPT FILED: $400. Receipt number LIT074746 (bmd)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Baptist Medcare Inc, Principal Life Insurance Company, Baptist Health, Baptist Health/Practice Plus, filed by Cherie Anderson. Summons not issued.(jak) (Docket text modified on 11/12/2019 to reference summons.) (thd).
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Cherie Anderson.(Fee of $400 received; summons not issued) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Principal Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Principal Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Edna Sybil Kersting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interventional Pain Management Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Medcare Inc
Represented By: Byron L. Freeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Health/Practice Plus
Represented By: Byron L. Freeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Health
Represented By: Byron L. Freeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherie Anderson
Represented By: Larry J. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?