Grier v. Daugherty et al
Plaintiff: Bruce Grier
Defendant: Stephen Daugherty and J&H Trucking Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00323
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Stephen Daugherty, J&H Trucking Inc. (Blair, Pamela)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/17/2020. Jury Trial set for 5/10/2021 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 12/4/2019. (slb)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 RECEIPT FILED: $400. Receipt number LIT074835 (bmd)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Stephen Daugherty, J&H Trucking Inc.(Blair, Pamela)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Bruce Grier.(wbb)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Crittenden County Circuit Court, case number CV-2019-866. (Fee of $400 received) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grier v. Daugherty et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Daugherty
Represented By: Pamela Warnock Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&H Trucking Inc
Represented By: Pamela Warnock Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Grier
Represented By: Jay Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?