Miller v. Marshel et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Miller
Defendant: Trish Marshel, Doyle Ramey, Alex Edmond and Alex Edmand
Case Number: 3:2019cv00326
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Patricia S Harris
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 13 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ajt)
January 10, 2020 Filing 12 JUDGMENT: Miller's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 01/10/2020. (ajt)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The Court withdraws the reference. Miller hasn't filled a free-world application to proceed in forma pauperis; and the time to do has passed. #2 Complaint will therefore be dismissed without prejudice. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 01/10/2020. (ajt)
December 24, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Christopher Miller re #6 Order. Previously resent to updated address. (jbh)
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Christopher Miller re 1983 complaint form. (jak)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER. Plaintiff, a former resident at Pointsett County Detention Center, filed a pro se complaint (Doc. No. #1 ) pursuant to 42.US.C. 1983, on 11/14/2019, and was granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP) pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). (Doc. No. #3 ). Plaintiff filed a change of address notice indicating that he has now been released from custody. (Doc. No. #7 ). When a plaintiff is released from confinement, the Court's policy is to require re-submission of affidavits to determine whether he should be required to pay all, or a portion of, the fees and costs of the lawsuit. If plaintiff wishes to proceed with this lawsuit, he is directed to pay the $350.00 filing fee, or to resubmit an IFP application which reflects his free-world financial status, no later than 30 days after the entry date of this order. Plaintiff's failure to do so will result in the recommended dismissal of this lawsuit. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT: the Clerk is directed to forward an IFP application to plaintiff; plaintiff is directed to submit the remainder of his $350.00 filing fee, or to complete and sign the IFP application, and file it, no later than 30 days after the entry date of this order. Plaintiff's failure to do so will result in the recommended dismissal of his complaint..Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 12/6/2019. (cfd) (Docket text modified on 12/9/2019 to correct a typographical error) (jak)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher Miller. (cmn)
December 3, 2019 Remark: Copy of #6 Order mailed to the Poinsett County Detention Center. Copy of 1983 complaint form mailed to Plaintiff. (jak)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Miller will be obligated to make monthly payments from his prison trust account to the Clerk of the Court until a total of $350 has been paid. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Poinsett County Sheriff. Miller must file an amended complaint no later than 30 days after this order's entry date. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Miller a blank 1983 complaint form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 12/3/2019. (jak)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Miller.(jak)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to the Court by Christopher Miller. (jak)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS denying without prejudice #1 IFP application; directing the Clerk of Court to enclose an IFP application along with a copy of this order; directing Miller to return a completed IFP application or pay the $400 filing and administrative fees within 30 days of the date of this order; directing the Clerk of Court to mail a copy of this order to the Poinsett County Sheriff; and instructing jail staff to assist Plaintiff in completing the required forms for his in forma pauperis application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 11/18/2019. (ljb)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Christopher Miller.(jak)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Miller.(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Marshel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trish Marshel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doyle Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Edmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Edmand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?