Jones v. Molder et al
Plaintiff: Rodrigues Jones
Defendant: Trish Marshal, Doyle Ramey, Steve Roex and Kevin Molder
Case Number: 3:2019cv00331
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending #2 Plaintiff's Complaint against Defendants be dismissed without prejudice, for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; dismissal of this action constitute a "strike" within the meaning of the Prison Litigation Reform Act (PLRA), 28 U.S.C. 1915(g); and the Court certify that an in forma pauperis appeal from an Order and Judgment dismissing this action would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 01/08/2020. (ajt)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Rodrigues Jones re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #2 Complaint. (fjg)
November 22, 2019 Remark: Mailed Plaintiff copy of 1983 Complaint form and mailed a copy of #5 Order to Poinsett County Detention Center. (ajt)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; directing Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint in accordance with the above instructions within 30 days from the date of this Order; directing the Clerk to mail Plaintiff the Court-provided 1983 Complaint form; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the Poinsett County Detention Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/22/2019. (ajt)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/22/2019. (lmc)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (lack of signature on file mark) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to docket entry #1 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Rodrigues Jones.(wbb)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rodrigues Jones. (wbb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Molder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trish Marshal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doyle Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Roex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Molder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodrigues Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?