Cox v. Day et al
Plaintiff: Jervontae Cox
Defendant: Michael Zwerlein, John Bradley, Jason Simpkins, Melinda Diaz, Kimberly Sigman, Leslie Mason, Darla Atchely, Chelsey Grimes, Keveon Day, Johnathon Frazier, Ronnie McShan, Curtis Walker, Vanessa Stewart, Stephen Sigman, Leann Norman, James Kemp, Shannon Langston, John Barttelt, Teri Looney, Cindy Thyer, Monica Harris, Mississippi County Jail and Ross Thompson
Case Number: 3:2019cv00387
Filed: December 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Referring Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #6 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Crittenden County Detention Center. An initial partial filing fee of $11.16 is assessed against the Plaintiff. The Administrator of the Crittenden County Detention Center shall continue to withdraw monthly payments and forward them to the Clerk of the Court until the filing fee has been paid in full. The following defendants are dismissed without prejudice from this case: Shannon Langston; Johnathon Frazier; Teri Looney; Kimberly Sigman; Michael Zwerlein; Chelsy Grimes; Darla Atchely; Melinda Diaz; James Kemp; Leann Norman; Ronnie McShan; Curtis Walker; Leslie Mason; John Bradley; Ross Thompson; Cindy Thyer. The Mississippi County Jail is dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's conditions of confinement claims are severed and dismissed without prejudice. #11 Motion for summary judgment is denied. This case will be administratively terminated. If Plaintiff does not file a timely motion to reopen within 60 days of the final disposition of his state court criminal case or a status report by 3/1/2020, then the Court will reopen the case and dismiss it without prejudice. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 2/20/2020. (jak)
February 13, 2020 Filing 15 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Jervontae Cox re #8 Order of Recusal, 9 Text Entry Only Notice of Reassignment. Previously resent to updated address. (fjg)
February 12, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE to the Court by Jervontae Cox. (ljb)
February 11, 2020 Filing 13 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Jervontae Cox re #7 Amended Complaint. Previously resent to updated address. (fjg)
February 5, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jervontae Cox.(kdr)
February 5, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Notice of Address Change by Jervontae Cox. (kdr)
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jervontae Cox.(kdr)
January 29, 2020 Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #8 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. (jak)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER of Recusal. The Clerk must reassign this case at random by chip exchange. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/29/2020. (jak)
January 28, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jervontae Cox. (llg)
January 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jervontae Cox. (wbb)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying without prejudice #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Cox must submit a completed application by 2/6/2020. The Court directs the Clerk to mail Cox and in forma pauperis application with a copy of this Order. The Court alerts the parties that it's also been assigned Cox's pending federal revocation, which is on hold until Cox's state charges are resolved, No. 35 in E.D. Ark. No. 4:15-cr-00179 DPM. The Court doesn't believe this creates a conflict; but if any party disagrees, it may file a paper setting out its concerns. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/6/2020. (jak)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/6/2020. (jak)
January 3, 2020 Filing 3 ADDENDUM to #2 Complaint filed by Jervontae Cox. (llg)
December 31, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jervontae Cox filed by Jervontae Cox. (llg)
December 31, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jervontae Cox. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Day et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Zwerlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Simpkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melinda Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Sigman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darla Atchely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsey Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keveon Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnathon Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie McShan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Sigman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leann Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Barttelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teri Looney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Thyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jervontae Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?