Cross et al v. Cross et al
Plaintiff: Bethany Cross, Paiton Turner, Melissa Moody Cross, Hunter Cross and Courtney Turner
Defendant: Katrina Cross, Does Owners of Custom Crafts; DHS; Mayor's wife; City Hall; School System; Custom Crafts Poultry, Holy Meyers, Weaver, Chaney Taylor and Elembaugh
Case Number: 3:2020cv00024
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Filing 12 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Melissa Moody Cross re #5 Order directing the Clerk to reassign this case, 6 Text Entry Only Notice of Reassignment. (fjg)
February 19, 2020 Filing 11 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Melissa Moody Cross re #8 Order dismissing without prejudice, #9 Judgment. (fjg)
February 11, 2020 Filing 10 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Melissa Moody Cross re Notice of Docket Correction re #7 Notice. (fjg)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JUDGMENT consistent with #8 Order, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/10/2020. (jak)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER dismissing without prejudice #2 Complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis is denied. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/10/2020. (jak)
February 3, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #7 Notice. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the file date as 1/31/2020 as marked on the document. (jak)
January 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE to the Court by Melissa Moody Cross.(jak) (Docket entry modified on 2/3/2020 to correct the file date) (jak)
January 27, 2020 Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to #5 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Brian S. Miller. (jak)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign this case to Judge Miller. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/27/2020. (jak)
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The civil cover sheet was not added as an attachment to docket entry #2 due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The civil cover sheet was added to docket entry #2 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER provisionally granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, pursuant to General Order No. 29. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 01/24/2020. (ajt)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Paiton Turner, Courtney Turner, Bethany Cross, Melissa Moody Cross, Hunter Cross.(ajt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jak).
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Melissa Moody Cross. (ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cross et al v. Cross et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethany Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paiton Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Moody Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hunter Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katrina Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does Owners of Custom Crafts; DHS; Mayor's wife; City Hall; School System; Custom Crafts Poultry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holy Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaney Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elembaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?