Jones v. Poinsett County Housing Authority
Plaintiff: Barbara Jones
Defendant: Poinsett County Housing Authority
Case Number: 3:2020cv00037
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Summons Issued as to Poinsett County Housing Authority. Forwarded to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (jak)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Jones's lawyers must prepare a summons, which the Clerk will issue, for Poinsett County Housing Authority. Counsel must deliver process to the U.S. Marshal for the Eastern District of Arkansas. The Court directs the Marshal to serve the summons and complaint without prepayment of fees. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/19/2020. (jak)
February 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The original document was attached to the docket in error (additional pages included) based on a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added as an attachment to docket entry #2 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (thd)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER provisionally granting re #1 Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, pursuant to General Order No. 29. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 01/31/2020.(wbb)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed by Barbara Jones against Poinsett County Housing Authority. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wbb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2020: #2 Main Document - Correct) (thd).
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Barbara Jones. (wbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Poinsett County Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Jones
Represented By: Trevor Scott Hawkins
Represented By: Kevin Robert De Liban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poinsett County Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?