Osko v. Twilley et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Osko
Defendant: Brockhouse Trucking, LLC and Matthew Twilley
Case Number: 3:2020cv00056
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #8 motion to extend time. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/16/2020. (gmh)
April 9, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Separate Defendant Matthew Twilley filed by Jonathan Osko. (fjg)
March 12, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Brockhouse Trucking, LLC.(Comstock, Christina)
March 9, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brockhouse Trucking, LLC, and Matthew Twilley, filed by Jonathan Osko (jap)
March 3, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 Affidavit of Service. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the file date as 3/2/2020 as marked on the document. (jak)
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint, filed by Jonathan Osko. Brockhouse Trucking, LLC served on 2/3/2020. (jap) (Docket entry modified on 3/3/2020 to correct the file date) (jak)
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Brockhouse Trucking, LLC (Comstock, Christina)
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Brockhouse Trucking, LLC.(Comstock, Christina)
February 19, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to remove the reference to a Jury Demand. (thd)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jonathan Osko.(wbb) (Docket text modified on 2/19/2020 to remove the reference to a Jury Demand.) (thd).
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND JURY DEMAND by Brockhouse Trucking, LLC from Fulton County Circuit Court, case number 25CV-19-103. (Fee $400. Receipt Number JON000884) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osko v. Twilley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brockhouse Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Christina D. Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Twilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Osko
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?